WA HB1014 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing "Native American Heritage Day."
Title
Recognizing "Native American Heritage Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-02-20 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-02-20 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-05 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-05 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2013-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |