WA HB1007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodating the civil rights of religious objectors to mandatory payments to labor organizations.
Title
Accommodating the civil rights of religious objectors to mandatory payments to labor organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1007&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1007.pdf |