WA HB1002 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting unfair and deceptive dental insurance practices.
Title
Prohibiting unfair and deceptive dental insurance practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Effective date 1/1/2017. |
2015-04-17 | House | Chapter 9, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-13 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |