WA HB1001 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veterans' burials.
Title
Concerning veterans' burials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-02-16 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5481 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.