WA HB1000 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding mental health support for law enforcement officers.
Title
Expanding mental health support for law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-12-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL
MENTAL HEALTH
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
MENTAL HEALTH
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)