VT S0295 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Agricultural Development, Including Agency Positions And Creation Of Development Board; Establishment Of Livestock Care Standards; Operation Of Commercial Slaughter Facilities; Animal Rescue Organizations; And Health Certificates For Importation Of Certain Animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Agricultural Development, Including Agency Positions And Creation Of Development Board; Establishment Of Livestock Care Standards; Operation Of Commercial Slaughter Facilities; Animal Rescue Organizations; And Health Certificates For Importation Of Certain Animals

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on June 3, 2010
2010-05-12 Delivered to Governor on May 28, 2010
2010-05-12 Title to bill amended by Secretary, per Senate Rule 40
2010-05-12 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-12 As passed by Senate and House
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report adopted
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kittell for Committee, text
2010-05-12 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-05-12 House message House adopted Conference Committee report
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
2010-05-12 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-08 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-08 Point of order sustained by the President
2010-05-08 Point of order raised by Senator Campbell on ground Conference Committee breached Sec. 770.2 of Mason's Manual of Legislative Procedure
2010-05-08 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kittell for Committee, text
2010-05-08 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-08 Committee of Conference Report
2010-05-07 House message House adopted Conference Committee report
2010-05-07 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-07 Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
2010-05-07 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 128 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 0
2010-05-08 Rep. Stevens of Shoreham demanded yeas and nays
2010-05-07 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-03 Speaker appointed Stevens of Shoreham, Taylor of Barre City and Malcolm of Pawlet as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2010-05-03 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-03 Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kittell, Starr, and Choate
2010-04-30 House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Kittell
2010-04-30 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-29 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-28 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2010-04-28 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-04-28 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-27 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-27 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2010-04-27 Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on Agriculture
2010-04-27 Read Second Time
2010-03-24 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
2010-03-23 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-03-23 As passed by Senate
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time & passed
2010-03-23 New Business/Third Reading
2010-03-19 3rd reading ordered
2010-03-19 Read 2nd time
2010-03-19 Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-03-18 New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-03-17 Committee Bill for Second Reading
2010-03-16 Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback