VT S0239 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Ensuring The Humane Treatment And Slaughter Of Animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Ensuring The Humane Treatment And Slaughter Of Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-21 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
2012-03-16 Read 3rd time & passed
2012-03-16 New Business/Third Reading
2012-03-15 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2012-03-15 Recommendation of amendment agreed to as substituted
2012-03-15 Motion by Senator(s) Giard to substitute recommendation of amendment for Agriculture recommendation of amendment agreed to
2012-03-15 Consideration resumed
2012-03-15 Consideration Postponed/Second Reading
2012-03-14 Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Campbell
2012-03-14 Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Giard for Committee on Agriculture
2012-03-14 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Giard on behalf of the Committee on Agriculture
2012-03-14 New Business/Second Reading
2012-03-13 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2012-03-13 Entered on Notice Calendar
2012-01-03 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback