VT S0179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to offender and inmate records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to offender and inmate records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-12SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Nitka for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-11SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-11HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2018-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2018-05-09HouseSpeaker appointed Emmons of Springfield, Shaw of Pittsford and Taylor of Colchester as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-05-09HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, Sears, and Flory
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-04HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-03HouseReport of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to.
2018-05-03HouseRep. Shaw of Pittsford reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2018-05-03HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-03HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-03-29HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Corrections and Institutions which was agreed to.
2018-02-08HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-06SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-02Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-02-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-02-02SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-02SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-01SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback