VT S0105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Governor vetoed bill on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to consumer justice enforcement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to consumer justice enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateGovernor vetoed bill on May 22, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDelivered to Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-04HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-04HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Parent of St. Albans Town disagreed to
2018-05-04HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe substituted as offered by Rep. Colburn of Burlington
2018-05-04HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 72, Nays = 59
2018-05-04HouseRep. Frenier of Chelsea moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Energy and Technology which was not agreed to.
2018-05-04HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington, Conquest of Newbury, and Grad of Moretown moved to substitute an amendment
2018-05-04HouseRep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2018-05-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-03HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-05-03HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-05-03HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 73
2018-05-03HouseRep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to commit the bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-03HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-05-03HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-02-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-13Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0
2018-02-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-02-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-09SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-02-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback