VT S0060 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the repeal of 21 V.S.A. §? 6

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the repeal of 21 V.S.A. §? 6

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
2017-05-01SenateSigned by Governor on May 1, 2017
2017-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor on April 25, 2017
2017-04-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-04-11SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-04-07HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-06HouseRep. Christie of Hartford reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-04-06HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-02-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-10SenateReported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-02-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2017-02-10SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-09SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2017-02-09SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-08SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2017-02-08SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-07SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2017-02-01SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback