VT S0052 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Public Service Board, energy, and telecommunications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Public Service Board, energy, and telecommunications

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on 5/30/17
2017-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on 5/24/17
2017-05-05SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-05SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2017-05-05HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
2017-05-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-05-05HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-05HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2017-05-05SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2017-05-05SenateProposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
2017-05-05SenateMotion disagreed to
2017-05-05SenateSenator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-05SenateMotion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Rodgers, Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 10, Nays = 20
2017-05-05SenateSenator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-05SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, Campion, Cummings, Degree, MacDonald, Pollina, and Sirotkin; text
2017-05-05SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-05SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campion, Cummings, Degree, MacDonald, Pollina, and Sirotkin
2017-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-03SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-02SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-01SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-27SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-26SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-04-26HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-04-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 0
2017-04-26HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-26HouseRead Third time
2017-04-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-26HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-25HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
2017-04-25HouseRep. Keenan of St. Albans City recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-04-25HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2017-04-25HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-03-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology
2017-03-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-23Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to
2017-03-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2017-03-23SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance
2017-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-03-23SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2017-01-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback