VT S0030 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to postpone action until May 17, 2022 which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to prohibiting possession of firearms within hospital buildings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to prohibiting possession of firearms within hospital buildings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-11 - Senate - Veto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 91, Nays = 53 (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 49 (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 90 (Y: 55 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Westman,  Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 10 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears,  Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-17HouseRep. Grad of Moretown moved to postpone action until May 17, 2022 which was agreed to
2022-03-16HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable
2022-03-17HouseAction Calendar: Governor’s Veto
2022-03-15HouseSenate Message, Governor's veto overridden
2022-03-11SenateVeto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2022-03-11SenateUnfinished Business/Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
2022-03-10SenateUnfinished Business/Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
2022-03-09SenateUnfinished Business/Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
2022-03-08SenateUnfinished Business/Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
2022-02-25SenateUnfinished Business/Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
2022-02-24SenatePending Question: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill??
2022-02-23HouseSenate Message, vetoed by Governor February 22, 2022
2022-02-23SenateVetoed by Governor & placed on notice calendar for February 23, 2022
2022-02-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2022-02-22SenateGovernor vetoed bill; text of veto message
2022-02-22SenateGovernor vetoed bill on February 22, 2022
2022-02-16SenateDelivered to Governor on February 16, 2022
2022-02-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2022-02-11SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2022-02-10HouseSenate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment agreed to
2022-02-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 91, Nays = 53
2022-02-10HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester demanded yeas and nays
2022-02-09HouseRep. Notte of Rutland City moved to postpone action until February 10, 2022 which was agreed to
2022-02-10HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2022-02-09HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2022-02-08HouseNotice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2022-02-04HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2022-02-03SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2022-02-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Baruth
2022-02-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2022-02-03SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-02-02SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2022-02-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2022-02-02SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2022-01-28HouseDivision results Yeas 84, nays 42
2022-01-28HouseDivision demanded
2022-01-28HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2022-01-28HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester withdrawn
2022-01-28HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2022-01-27HouseThird Reading ordered
2022-01-27HouseDivision results Yeas 93, Nays 47
2022-01-27HouseDivision demanded
2022-01-27HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2022-01-27HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 49
2022-01-27HouseRep. Peterson of Clarendon demanded yeas and nays
2022-01-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2022-01-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 90
2022-01-27HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester demanded yeas and nays
2022-01-27HouseRep. Smith of Derby moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Health Care
2022-01-27HouseRep. Notte of Rutland City reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-27HouseRead Second time
2022-01-27HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2022-01-26HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2021-03-24HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-19SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2021-03-19SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-03-18Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-03-18SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Westman, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 10
2021-03-18SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to in Sec. 2 on a roll call
2021-03-18SenateSenator White explained vote
2021-03-18SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9
2021-03-18SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to in Sec. 1 and Sec. 3 on a roll call
2021-03-18SenateQuestion on Judiciary recommendation of amendment, Sec 1&3,+ Sec 2 divided on request of Senator Benning
2021-03-18SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-18SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-18SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2021-03-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2022/S.30
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0030/S-0030%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0030/S-0030%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0030/S-0030%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/16
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/17
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/97
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/98
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/101
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/108
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/120

Bill Comments

feedback