VT H0052 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Signed by Governor on 4/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Definition Of Poultry Products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Definition Of Poultry Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 Signed by Governor on 4/28/2011
2011-04-26 Delivered to the Governor on 4/26/2011
2011-04-20 Passed the House and Senate on 4/19/2011
2011-04-19 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-04-19 Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2011-04-19 Unfinished Business/Third Reading
2011-04-18 New Business/Third Reading
2011-04-15 Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Agriculture, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2011-04-15 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-14 Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture
2011-04-14 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-13 Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture
2011-04-13 New Business/Second Reading
2011-04-12 Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture
2011-04-12 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-02-22 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2011-02-17 Read Third time and Passed
2011-02-16 Third Reading Ordered
2011-02-16 Amendment of Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2011-02-16 Rep. Conquest of Newbury spoke for the committee on Agriculture
2011-02-16 Read Second Time
2011-01-14 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback