VT H0112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor on May 8, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Labeling Of Food Produced With Genetic Engineering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Labeling Of Food Produced With Genetic Engineering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - Shall the House concur in the Senate's proposal of amendment? (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Shall the Senate propose to the House to amend the bill as recommended by the Committee on Agricultural, as amended? (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Johnson of Canaan? (Y: 45 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Johnson of Canaan? (Y: 45 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 107 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 107 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-08HouseSigned by Governor on May 8, 2014
2014-04-25SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2014-04-23HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 114, Nays = 30
2014-04-23HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2014-04-22HouseRep. Zagar of Barnard moved to postpone action until April 23, 2014 which was agreed to
2014-04-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2
2014-04-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2014-04-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2014-04-15SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 2
2014-04-15SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to
2014-04-15SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2014-04-15SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary
2014-04-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2014-04-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary with proposal of amendment
2014-04-15SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Zuckerman for Committee on Agriculture
2014-04-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2014-04-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-04-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2014-04-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2014-04-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2014-04-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-04-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2014-04-04SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2014-04-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-04-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2014-02-12SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Judiciary with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Starr
2014-02-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Starr
2014-02-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2014-01-07SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2013-05-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 42
2013-05-10HousePassed
2013-05-10HouseRead Third time
2013-05-10HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 91
2013-05-10HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Johnson of Canaan disagreed to
2013-05-10HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
2013-05-09HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 107, Nays = 38
2013-05-09HouseThird Reading Ordered
2013-05-09HouseRep. Michelsen of Hardwick, Toleno of Brattleboro, and Zagar of Barnard moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2013-05-09HouseAmendment of Committee on Agriculture and Forest Products agreed to
2013-05-08HouseRep. Rep. Conquest of Newbury, recommended for the committee on Judiciary
2013-05-09HouseRep. Zagar of Barnard reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forest Products
2013-05-09HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-13HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2013-01-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=H.0112&Session=2014
Texthttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/bills/Intro/H-112.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/bills/House/H-112.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/bills/Senate/H-112.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/bills/Passed/H-112.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/Acts/ACT120.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=669
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=672
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=673
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=763
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=764
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/rcdetail.cfm?Session=2014&RollCallID=767

Bill Comments

feedback