VT H0675 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to conditions of release prior to trial

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to conditions of release prior to trial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 29 (Y: 104 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 85 (Y: 53 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 112, Nays = 28 (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 46 (Y: 93 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateSenator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-12SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2018-05-12SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2018-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-11HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Sharpe of Bristol
2018-05-09HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2018-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-09SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-08Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as moved by Senator(s) Benning and Sears
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Education
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-08SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2018-05-08SenateReported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education with proposal of amendment
2018-05-08SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning and Sears
2018-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-04SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-04-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-04-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-25SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-20SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Education with the report of Committee on Judiciary intact, on motion of Senator Benning
2018-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-02HousePassed
2018-03-02HouseRead Third time
2018-03-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-03-02HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the bill
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-01HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 29
2018-03-01HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2018-03-01HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-03-01HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 85
2018-03-01HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseSecond instance of amendment agreed to
2018-03-01HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 112, Nays = 28
2018-03-01HouseFirst Instance of amendment agreed to
2018-03-01HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 46
2018-03-01HouseRep. Deen of Westminster asked that the question be divided
2018-03-01HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseRep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-19HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback