VA SR542 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR542ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Lieutenant Colonel Alexander Semyon Vindman, USA Ret.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Lieutenant Colonel Alexander Semyon Vindman, USA Ret.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25SenateBill text as passed Senate (SR542ER)
2020-09-25SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-09-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SR542S1
2020-09-25SenateSubstitute by Senator McPike agreed to 20201284D-S1
2020-09-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-25SenateFloor substitute printed 20201284D-S1 (McPike)
2020-09-16SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-15SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-10SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2020-09-10SenatePresented 20201103D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback