VA SR105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR105ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR105ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming nomination to the Senate Ethics Advisory Panel. Confirms the nomination of the Honorable Frederick M. Quayle by the Senate Committee on Rules to the Senate Ethics Advisory Panel.
Title
Confirming nomination to the Senate Ethics Advisory Panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate (SR105ER) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103875D |