VA SJR89 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Housing Commission; report. Directs the Virginia Housing Commission to study the impact of tenant bankruptcy proceedings on landlords in Virginia.
Title
Tenant bankruptcy; VHC to study impact of proceedings on landlords.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102055D |