VA SJR87 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Housing Commission; mandatory recycling programs for multifamily residential dwellings; report. Directs the Virginia Housing Commission to study the feasibility of requiring (i) the owner of every multifamily residential dwelling and (ii) the executive organ or common interest community manager for every condominium to develop and implement a plan for recycling solid waste generated by the multifamily residential dwelling or condominium.
Title
Multifamily residential dwellings; VHC to study mandatory recycling programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16104067D |