VA SJR84 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ84ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ84ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending H.A. Street.
Title
Commending H.A. Street.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ84ER) |
2020-02-03 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-01-31 | House | Received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Presented 20104494D |