VA SJR67 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 32-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 32-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; legalization and regulation of growth, sale and possession of marijuana; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study and make recommendations for how Virginia should go about legalizing and regulating the growth, sale, and possession of marijuana by July 1, 2022, and address the impacts of marijuana prohibition.
Title
Marijuana; JLARC to study legalization of growth, sale, and possession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 32-N) (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 32-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (61-Y 32-N) |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-08 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | House | Delegates: Heretick, Herring, Collins |
2020-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Ebbin, Pillion |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (31-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ67H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108662D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108662D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105391D-E |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ67E |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McClellan agreed to |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105391D |