VA SJR67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Westfield High School field hockey team.
Title
Commending the Westfield High School field hockey team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER) |
2018-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-01-19 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-01-19 | House | Received |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Presented 18105000D |