VA SJR61 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Constitution Day. Designates June 29, in 2016 and in each succeeding year, as Virginia Constitution Day in Virginia.
Title
Virginia Constitution Day; designating as June 29, 2016, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER) |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Taken up |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103128D |