VA SJR5005 | 2013 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5005ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5005ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Becky Alexander.
Title
Commending Becky Alexander.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5005ER) |
2013-04-03 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-04-03 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2013-04-03 | House | Received |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 13200041D |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 04/03/13 13200041D |