VA SJR42 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognition of the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia. Extends state recognition to the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia within the Commonwealth.
Title
Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia; extends state recognition within the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104132D |