VA SJR400 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Bureau of Financial Institutions to study development loan defaults; report. Requests the Bureau of Financial Institutions of the State Corporation Commission to convene members of the financial services, homebuilding, and commercial development industries to (i) review whether loans on development projects are being called as a result of a reduction in the debt to value ratio or the debt to equity ratio, or both, with respect to the borrower's property; (ii) determine whether banks are being required or encouraged to call such loans under federal regulations or as a condition of participation in federal programs; and (iii) determine whether changes in Virginia law would insulate solvent borrowers from adverse action on their loans without jeopardizing the ability of banks in Virginia to participate in federal programs or comply with federal regulations. The Bureau's report is to be provided by October 31, 2011.
Title
Development loan defaults; Bureau of Financial Institutions of SCC to review certain issues, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104449D | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Banking and Finance
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SJ400 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SJ400+hil |