VA SJR39 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR39

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; effect of abolishing jury sentencing on the justice system; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to (i) identify the most common charges tried before juries within the Commonwealth and determine the average sentence per charge as recommended by a jury; (ii) compare the jury-recommended sentence to the average sentence for each identified charge, factoring in alternative sentences and suspended time, as determined by a judge during a bench trial; (iii) identify any perceived negative impacts to the judicial system associated with abolishing the practice of jury sentencing and make recommendations as to how these potential negative impacts could be avoided; and (iv) determine the feasibility of abolishing jury sentencing for noncapital offenses within the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice system; Virginia State Crime Commission to study effect of abolishing jury sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-02-05SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104551D

Same As/Similar To

SJR39 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback