VA SJR358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prince Edward County Public Schools closing. Commemorates the 60th anniversary of the closing of Prince Edward County Public Schools.
Title
Prince Edward County Public Schools closing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-02-18 | House | Received |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Presented 19105642D |