VA SJR358 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month. Designates March, in 2016 and in each succeeding year, as Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month; designating as March 2016, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15104940D |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |