VA SJR353 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Cabell F. Willis.
Title
Commending Cabell F. Willis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-20 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2015-02-20 | House | Received |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Presented 15103405D |