VA SJR344 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 78-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 78-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); personal property tax exemption on boats and watercrafts. Allows the General Assembly to enact a general law allowing a locality to have the option to provide for a partial exemption for boats and watercrafts from local personal property taxation.
Title
Constitutional amendment; personal property tax exemption on boats and watercraft (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 78-N) (Y: 20 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 78-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Rejected by House (19-Y 78-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Constitutional Amendments, Reapportionment, Referenda | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103278D |
Subjects
Constitutional Amendments
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation