VA SJR332 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments of certain persons. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor McAuliffe and communicated to the General Assembly on January 29, 2015.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Appointments |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ332S1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104972D-S1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104972D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15104656D |