VA SJR325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Harold J. Roesch II.
Title
Commending Harold J. Roesch II.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ325ER) |
2021-02-01 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-01-29 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-01-29 | House | Received |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented 21102885D |