VA SJR301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ301ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ301ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century continued; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century for two additional years, through December 1, 2021.
Title
Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the 21st Century; Joint Subcommittee Studying, cont'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ301ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103005D |