VA SJR286 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR286
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ286ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ286ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Management Professionals Week. Designates the third week in March, in 2021 and in each succeeding year, as Emergency Management Professionals Week in Virginia.
Title
Emergency Management Professionals Week; designating third week in March, in 2021 & each succeeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ286ER) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101310D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR286 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote