VA SJR271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; long-term impact of biosolids and industrial waste; report. Requests the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Health and Human Resources, and the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a joint task force to review and evaluate existing scientific literature on the impact of biosolids and industrial residuals on human health and the environment.
Title
Biosolids and industrial residuals; SNR, et al., to review & evaluate impact on human health, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Knight, Fowler, Lopez |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Norment, McDougle, Alexander |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request |
2015-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute (84-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ271H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105117D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105117D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ271S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104397D-S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SJ244 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104397D-S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102842D |
Same As/Similar To
SJ244 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Incorporated by Rules