VA SJR238 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); qualifications to vote; restoration of civil rights. Authorizes the General Assembly to provide by law for the restoration of civil rights to persons convicted of nonviolent felonies who have completed service of their sentences, including any period or condition of parole, probation, or suspension of sentence, subject to the conditions, requirements, and definitions set forth in that law. At present, the Constitution of Virginia authorizes the Governor to restore civil rights to persons convicted of a felony; that provision is retained.
Title
Constitutional amendment; qualifications to vote, restoration of civil rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (27-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (34-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102377D |