VA SJR22 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR22
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Taxation; reducing economic stress on retired Virginia State Police; report. Directs the Department of Taxation to study tax policy solutions for reducing economic stress on retired Virginia State Police.
Title
Virginia State Police, retired; TAX to study reducing economic stress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103419D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR22 (Carry Over) 2024-02-28 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote