VA SJR180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ180ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ180ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Historic Smithfield Plantation in Blacksburg as "a Family Homestead of Virginia Governors."
Title
Historic Smithfield Plantation in Blacksburg; designating as a Family Homestead of Va. Governors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ180ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Taken up |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14105423D-E |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ180E |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14105423D |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |