VA SJR171 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ171ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ171ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Julie Ball.
Title
Commending Julie Ball.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ171ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Received | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 12105054D | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Presented 12105054D |