VA SJR143 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER)
Summary
Commending the Virginia National Guard.
Title
Commending the Virginia National Guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ143ER) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-21 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-02-21 | House: Received | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 088952240 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Presented 088952240 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ143 |