VA SJR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ129ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ129ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February 14, 2012, as Breast Cancer Awareness Day.
Title
Breast Cancer Awareness Day; designating as February 14, 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ129ER) | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ129S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105358D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105358D-S1 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104482D |