VA SJR123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ123ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ123ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Nicole DeMasters Bendily.
Title
Celebrating the life of Nicole DeMasters Bendily.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ123ER) |
2022-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-02-18 | House | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Presented 22106226D |