VA SJR102 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ102ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ102ER)
Summary
Study; support services for family caregivers of the frail elderly and disabled and community-based caregiver support organizations; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study support services for family caregivers of the frail elderly and disabled and community-based caregiver support organizations.
Title
Family caregivers; Joint Commission on Health Care to study support services therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ102ER) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-05 | House: Taken up | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081207332 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ102 |