VA SJR10 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; strategies for improving access to higher education for students with developmental and intellectual disabilities; report. Requests the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia (SCHEV) to study strategies for improving access to higher education for students with developmental and intellectual disabilities. In conducting the study, SCHEV shall report on the number and percentage of students with developmental and intellectual disabilities who were enrolled at each public institution of higher education based on the fall counts for the 2014-2015 academic year, identify strategies that public institutions of higher education in other states use to improve access to higher education for students with developmental and intellectual disabilities, recommend strategies that the institution could use to annually increase the percentage of enrolled students with developmental and intellectual disabilities, and estimate the fiscal impact to the institution of an annual increase in the percentage of enrolled students with developmental and intellectual disabilities. The study is a recommendation of the Disability Commission.
Title
Students with developmental and intellectual disabilities; SCHEV to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ10S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104549D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104549D-S1 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules by voice vote |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100344D |
Subjects
Education
Educational Institutions
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Educational Institutions
Persons with Disabilities
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports