VA SB967 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - VOTE: Reconsideration rejected (47-Y 53-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - VOTE: Reconsideration rejected (47-Y 53-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; notice of intent to file certificate. Provides that the notice required to be sent to a landowner prior to an authorized condemnor recording a certificate of take or certificate of deposit shall state that (i) the certificate of take or certificate of deposit will be recorded between 30 and 45 days from the date of the notice and (ii) that the property will transfer to the condemnor upon recordation and that the owner has the right to petition the court for distribution of the funds represented in the certificate.
Title
Eminent domain; notice of intent to file certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Reconsideration rejected (47-Y 53-N) (Y: 47 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (39-Y 60-N) (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (39-Y 60-N) (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Reconsideration rejected (47-Y 53-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action rejected by House (47-Y 53-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (39-Y 60-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Defeated by House (39-Y 60-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108418D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108418D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105266D-E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB967E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105266D |