VA SB967 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Port Authority; Chesapeake Economic Development Authority; transfer of powers. Permits the City Council of Chesapeake to transfer the powers of the Chesapeake Port Authority to the Chesapeake Economic Development Authority. Such transfer has the effect of dissolving the Chesapeake Port Authority.
Title
Local industrial development authorities; port authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 162 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB967ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB967S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17103982D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17103982D-S1 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102302D |
Subjects
Authorities
Chesapeake City of
Counties Cities and Towns
Ordinances
Uncodified Legislation
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Chesapeake City of
Counties Cities and Towns
Ordinances
Uncodified Legislation
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 4901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |