VA SB967 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Family life education. Requires each school division to implement the standards of learning for the family life education program promulgated by the Board of Education, or a family life education program consistent with the guidelines developed by the Board, which shall have the goals of reducing the incidence of pregnancy, sexually transmitted disease, and substance abuse among teenagers. Any curricula or materials used must be evidence-based and supported by peer reviewed medical research.
Title
Family life education; requires school division to implement standards of learning program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | House: Left in Education | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101966D |