VA SB964 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; catastrophic health plans. Authorizes health carriers to offer catastrophic plans on the individual market and to offer such plans to all individuals. The measure provides that a catastrophic plan is deemed to provide an essential health benefits package and to meet certain requirements of federal law. A catastrophic plan is a high-deductible health care plan that provides essential health benefits and coverage for at least three primary care visits per policy year. Under the federal Affordable Care Act, catastrophic plans satisfy requirements that health benefit plans provide minimum levels of coverage only if they cover individuals who are under 30 years of age or who qualify for a hardship exemption or affordability exemption. The measure requires the Commissioner of Insurance to apply to the federal government for a state innovation waiver allowing the implementation of the provision. The provision will become effective 30 days after the Commissioner notifies certain persons that the request has been approved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; catastrophic health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 20-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB964ER)
2018-03-09SenateEnrolled
2018-03-07SenateTitle replaced 18107633D-H1
2018-03-07SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB964H1
2018-03-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107633D-H1
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107633D-H1
2018-03-01HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-05SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104904D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823446.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB964
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB964+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB964H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB964ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0084+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0238+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0494SB0964+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0497SB0964+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0501SB0964+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0205+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1350+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1040SB0964+SB0964
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1245SB0964+SB0964

Bill Comments

feedback