VA SB949 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit for hybrid vehicle registration. Creates a $64 tax credit for the 2015 tax year for hybrid vehicle owners who paid the $64 annual license tax between July 1, 2013, and July 1, 2014. The bill has a July 1, 2018, expiration date.
Title
Hybrid vehicle registration; tax credit for certain vehicle owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to Web only 15104389D-S1 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102386D |